Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gary Michael Gordon

Bishop of Victoria, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1957 BornBurnaby
22 May 198224.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
5 Jan 200648.6AppointedBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
22 Mar 200648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
14 Jun 201457.0AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
28 Aug 201457.2InstalledBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gary Michael Gordon:
Bishop Gary Michael Gordon (born ) Bishop of Victoria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Victoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,092
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2014
  • i: CB, 25 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014