Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Felipe Vila

Bishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1962 Born
14 May 199532.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Nov 201553.1AppointedBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
7 Feb 201653.3Ordained BishopBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada

MicroData Summary for Héctor Felipe Vila
Bishop Héctor Felipe Vila (born ) Bishop of Whitehorse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Whitehorse.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2015
  • c2: CB, 20 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 3 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast