Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gérald Cyprien Cardinal Lacroix, I.S.P.X.

Archbishop of Québec

Cardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe all’Aurelio

Note/Previous Titular See: Pius X Secular Institute


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1957 BornSaint-Hilaire de Dorset
8 Oct 198831.2Ordained PriestPriest of Other
7 Apr 200951.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
7 Apr 200951.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
24 May 200951.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta
22 Feb 201153.6AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
25 Mar 201153.7InstalledArchbishop of Québec, Canada
22 Feb 201456.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201456.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giuseppe all’Aurelio

MicroData Summary for Gérald Cyprien Lacroix:
Gérald Cyprien Cardinal Lacroix I.S.P.X. (born ) Archbishop of Québec

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Québec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,180
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014