Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Corriveau

Auxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Arena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1964 Born
15 Aug 198925.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Québec, Canada
16 Jun 199026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
25 Oct 201652.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
25 Oct 201652.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arena
8 Dec 201652.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arena

MicroData Summary for Louis Corriveau
Bishop Louis Corriveau (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Marie-de-Beauce, Archdiocese of Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Québec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jan 2017