Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaétan Proulx, O.S.M.

Bishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1947 Born
5 Sep 196922.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
2 Dec 197326.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
8 Jun 197528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
12 Dec 201164.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
12 Dec 201164.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Azura
25 Feb 201264.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azura
2 Jul 201669.0AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
16 Sep 201669.3InstalledBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gaétan Proulx
Bishop Gaétan Proulx O.S.M. (born ) Bishop of Gaspé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Denis-de-Brompton
Ordained PriestSt-Denis-de-Brompton
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne-de-Beaupré, Basilica, Sainte-Anne-de-Beaupré, Archdiocese of Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gaspé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2011
  • pr/so/c1: CB, 12 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,265
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2016
  • loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 15 Apr 2019

Quantcast