Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Lemay

Bishop of Amos, Québec, Canada

Apostolic Administrator of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1948 Born
18 Jun 197224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
11 Feb 200556.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
11 Feb 200556.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
10 Apr 200557.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga
22 Feb 201162.9AppointedBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
15 Apr 201163.1InstalledBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
25 Jun 201971.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rouyn-Noranda, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gilles Lemay
Bishop Gilles Lemay (born ) Bishop of Amos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Emmélie, Leclercville
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne-de-Beaupré, Basilica, Sainte-Anne-de-Beaupré

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,851
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ab: CB, 25 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 10 Jul 2019

Quantcast