Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène Tremblay

Bishop Emeritus of Amos, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1936 BornSaint-Hilarion
24 Jun 196226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
3 Nov 199458.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
3 Nov 199458.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Succuba
6 Jan 199558.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Succuba
3 May 200468.2AppointedBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada
22 Feb 201175.0RetiredBishop of Amos, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Eugène Tremblay:
Bishop Eugène Tremblay (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Amos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,466

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013