Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Albert Cardinal Vachon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Québec

Cardinal-Priest of San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1912BornSaint-Frédéric-de-Beauce
11 Jun 193826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
4 Apr 197765.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
4 Apr 197765.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
14 May 197765.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
20 Mar 198169.1AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
25 May 198573.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198573.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Paolo della Croce a “Corviale”
17 Mar 199078.1RetiredArchbishop of Québec, Canada
29 Sep 200694.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-Albert Vachon:
Louis-Albert Cardinal Vachon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Québec

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
  • a cardinal for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015