Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Paul Pierre Morissette

Bishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1944 Born
8 Jun 196823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
27 Feb 198742.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
27 Feb 198742.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
12 Jun 198742.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mesarfelta
17 Mar 199045.3AppointedBishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec, Canada
2 May 199045.4InstalledBishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec, Canada
3 Jul 200863.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Paul Pierre Morissette
Bishop Joseph Paul Pierre Morissette (born ) Bishop of Saint-Jérôme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThetford-Mines

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Jérôme.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,149
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018