Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint-Jérôme - Mont-Laurier

Dioecesis Sancti Hieronymi Terraebonae-Montis Laurei



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Raymond Poisson, Bishop
  • Gilles Cazabon, O.M.I., Bishop Emeritus
  • Paul Lortie, Bishop Emeritus
  • Vital Massé, Bishop Emeritus
  • Joseph Paul Pierre Morissette, Bishop Emeritus
  • Donald Lapointe, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • United: 1 June 2022
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Montréal
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 22,084 (8,529 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Official Web Site: https://ecdl.ca
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 355 place du Cure-Labelle, Saint-Jér&ocaret;me, QC J7Z 5A9, Canada
  • Telephone: (450)432-9742
  • Fax: 432-8155

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
23 June 1951ErectedDiocese of Mont-Laurier (3 parishes in Argenteuil)
Archdiocese of Montréal (18 parishes in Terrebonne; 8 parishes from Deux Montagnes; and 4 parishes from Argenteuil)
Archdiocese of Ottawa (7 parishes from Argenteuil)
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme (erected)
25 November 1952Territory AddedArchdiocese of Montréal (St. Maurice de Bois des Fillion in Terrebonne)
Archdiocese of Ottawa (Kilmar in Argenteuil)
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
16 May 1957Territory AddedArchdiocese of Montréal (Saint-Eustache; Saint-Agapit (St-Eustache on the Lake); Saint-Joseph-du-Lac; Marie-Médiatrice (Pointe-Calumet); Annunciation B.V.M. (Oka); and St. Charles (Lachenaie)) Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme - Mont-Laurier
1 June 2022UnitedDiocese of Mont-Laurier
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme - Mont-Laurier

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
1966143,895160,09589.9%15812828650318642858ap1967
1970157,904169,46993.2%12211523766625945556ap1971
1976191,665226,82584.5%111361471,303221240063ap1977
1980238,403271,00088.0%1001212211,078227630663ap1981
1990297,248322,25092.2%921272191,357527829968ap1991
1999390,576420,62992.9%841162001,9521523326666ap2000
2000390,576420,57692.9%831051882,0771621425065ap2001
2001390,576420,57692.9%801021822,1461820724865ap2002
2002390,576420,57692.9%7622983,9851910218359ap2003
2003390,576420,57692.9%75841592,4561816418550ap2004
2004407,065419,15097.1%71811522,6781715517350ap2005
2010428,000439,00097.5%73371103,890194412834ap2011
2014446,000459,00097.2%5215676,65618219735ap2015
2017461,510474,81597.2%4617637,32518268835ap2018
2020419,086653,33664.1%5112636,65218175833ap2021
Diocese of Saint-Jérôme - Mont-Laurier
2022500,732778,47664.3%7411855,89019145745ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Saint-Jérôme
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 43, Page 830, to Page 832
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 299
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 510, and Page 511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.5, 28 Jan 2024; Data: 28 Jan 2024