Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Saint-Gelais

Bishop Emeritus of Nicolet, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1936 Born
12 Jun 196024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
5 Jul 198044.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
5 Jul 198044.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
31 Jul 198044.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
19 Feb 198851.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
25 Apr 198852.0InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
14 Mar 198952.9SucceededBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
11 Jul 201175.3RetiredBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Raymond Saint-Gelais
Bishop Raymond Saint-Gelais (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nicolet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaie Saint-Paul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nicolet.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018