Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Émile Charbonneau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hull, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1922BornSainte-Thérèse-de-Blainville
31 May 194725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
15 Nov 196038.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
15 Nov 196038.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
18 Jan 196138.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
21 May 196341.0AppointedBishop of Hull, Québec, Canada
12 Apr 197350.9ResignedBishop of Hull, Québec, Canada
20 May 201492.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hull, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul-Émile Charbonneau:
Bishop Paul-Émile Charbonneau (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hull

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 53.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 23 May 2014
  • d: CB, 4 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014