Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Gatineau

Archidioecesis Gatinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul-André Durocher, Archbishop
  • Roger Ébacher, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 28 October 2005
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 6,445 (2,489 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: GH
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesegatineau.org/
  • Mailing Address: Centre Diocesain, 180 boul. Mont-Bleu, Hull, QC J8Z 3J5, Canada
  • Telephone: (819)771-8391
  • Fax: 778-8969

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Hull
27 April 1963ErectedArchdiocese of Ottawa Diocese of Hull (erected)
Diocese of Gatineau-Hull
1 March 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Hull Diocese of Gatineau-Hull
Archdiocese of Gatineau-Hull
31 October 1990ElevatedDiocese of Gatineau-Hull Archdiocese of Gatineau-Hull
Archdiocese of Gatineau
28 October 2005Name ChangedArchdiocese of Gatineau-Hull Archdiocese of Gatineau

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Hull
1966127,770153,00083.5%12911224153013455361ap1967
1970134,243154,01987.2%1218220366112252555ap1971
1976150,230181,00083.0%10676182825210632458ap1977
1980186,000206,00090.3%78731511,231110136850ap1981
Diocese of Gatineau-Hull
Archdiocese of Gatineau-Hull
1990203,200226,00089.9%59561151,76626329466ap1991
1999220,023254,80886.3%4737842,6194024460ap2000
2000220,023254,80886.3%4739862,55814523461ap2001
2001220,023254,80886.3%4841892,47214722461ap2002
2002238,646276,37186.3%5138892,68114121261ap2003
2003238,646276,37186.3%5033832,87514220061ap2004
2004238,646276,37186.3%4733802,98314419961ap2005
Archdiocese of Gatineau
2006231,325277,19283.5%4729763,0433920261ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014