Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roger Ébacher

Archbishop Emeritus of Gatineau, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1936--> Born
27 May 196124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Amos, Québec, Canada
30 Jun 197942.7AppointedBishop of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
31 Jul 197942.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
30 Mar 198851.4AppointedBishop of Gatineau-Hull, Québec, Canada
6 May 198851.5InstalledBishop of Gatineau-Hull, Québec, Canada
31 Oct 199054.0AppointedArchbishop of Gatineau-Hull, Québec, Canada
12 Oct 201175.0RetiredArchbishop of Gatineau, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Roger Ébacher
(VIAF: 16378724; WikiData: Q2161964)
Archbishop Roger Ébacher (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gatineau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmos, Diocese of Amos, Québec
Ordained PriestCathedral, Amos, Diocese of Amos, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-Eudes, Cathedral, Baie-Comeau, Diocese of Hauterive, Québec

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gatineau.

  • a priest for --> years
  • a bishop for --> years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011
  • c1/loc: CB, 12 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,040
  • b: Dictionnaire Biographique des Évèques Catholiques du Canada, Page 479, to Page 481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024