Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Baie-Comeau

Dioecesis Sinus Comoënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jean-Pierre Blais, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 14 July 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Rimouski
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Québec
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 148,750 (57,454 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Quebec
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: BC
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-bc.org/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 639 rue de Bretagne, Baie-Comeau, QC G5C 1X2, Canada
  • Telephone: (418)589-5744
  • Fax: 295-3145

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
29 May 1882ErectedDiocese of Rimouski (St. Germain of) Prefecture Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
12 September 1905ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
13 July 1945Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Baie d’Hudson {Hudson Bay}
Vicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent
Diocese of Harbour Grace
Vicariate Apostolic of Labrador (erected)
Diocese of Golfe St-Laurent
24 November 1945ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent Diocese of Golfe St-Laurent
Diocese of Hauterive
29 February 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Golfe St-Laurent Diocese of Hauterive
Diocese of Baie-Comeau
14 July 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Hauterive Diocese of Baie-Comeau
31 May 2007Territory AddedDiocese of Labrador City-Schefferville (suppressed) Diocese of Amos (Nunavik Territory)
Diocese of Baie-Comeau (La Basse C“te Nord Territory)
Diocese of Corner Brook and Labrador (Labrador Territory)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Golfe St-Laurent
195028,00030,00093.3%2422466083211027ap1951
Diocese of Hauterive
196683,95085,85797.8%82381206995532942ap1967
197086,00090,00095.6%78401187287630844ap1971
197697,483102,82494.8%5635911,0716427552ap1977
1980120,000121,90098.4%5330831,4455629550ap1981
Diocese of Baie-Comeau
199096,12898,52197.6%4421651,47884215250ap1991
199992,66595,64296.9%3119501,8537289349ap2000
200093,12696,27796.7%3118491,9007278849ap2001
200194,36996,27798.0%3117481,9667268345ap2002
200289,29890,85998.3%2818461,9417277245ap2003
200389,26190,90798.2%2716432,0757256445ap2004
200489,23290,90798.2%2714412,1767196445ap2005
200690,80092,60098.1%2511362,5228165944ap2007
201290,40098,40091.9%259342,658793755ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013