Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Blais

Bishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1949 BornSaint-Anselme
11 May 197424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
3 Nov 199445.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
3 Nov 199445.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tinum
6 Jan 199545.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tinum
12 Dec 200859.5AppointedBishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec, Canada
11 Mar 200959.8InstalledBishop of Baie-Comeau, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Blais:
Bishop Jean-Pierre Blais (born ) Bishop of Baie-Comeau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baie-Comeau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 10 Jan 2015