Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julien-Marie Leventoux, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec

Titular Bishop of Legio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1868BornTrélivan, France
11 Jun 189223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
28 Mar 192253.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
28 Mar 192253.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Legio
11 Jun 192253.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Legio
Jan 1938³69.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
3 Sep 194677.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julien-Marie Leventoux:
Bishop Julien-Marie Leventoux C.I.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013