Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste Delisle, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lokoja, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1908Born
17 Jun 192718.9EnteredMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
8 Jun 193425.9Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 Jun 193425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 May 195546.8AppointedPrefect of Kabba, Nigeria
6 Jul 196455.9AppointedBishop of Kabba, Nigeria
24 Aug 196456.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kabba, Nigeria
30 Jul 197264.0ResignedBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
13 Nov 200698.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Lokoja, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Auguste Delisle
Bishop Auguste Delisle C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lokoja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Canada
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 72.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • perp/c1: CB, 9 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 17 Sep 2017