Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Raymond Windle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1917BornAshdad
16 May 194325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
15 Nov 196043.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
15 Nov 196043.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzita
18 Jan 196143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzita
23 Jan 196951.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
8 Feb 197153.4SucceededBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
5 May 199375.6RetiredBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
24 Sep 199780.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Raymond Windle:
Bishop Joseph Raymond Windle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pembroke

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015