Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Matthew Wingle

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1946 Born
16 Apr 197730.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
31 May 199346.6AppointedBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
24 Aug 199346.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada
9 Nov 200155.1AppointedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
24 Jan 200255.3InstalledBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
7 Apr 201063.5ResignedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Matthew Wingle
Bishop James Matthew Wingle (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEganville

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Catharines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018