Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Lortie

Bishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1944 BornBeauport
16 May 197026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
7 Apr 200965.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
7 Apr 200965.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
24 May 200965.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
2 Feb 201267.9AppointedBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada
15 Mar 201268.0InstalledBishop of Mont-Laurier, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul Lortie:
Bishop Paul Lortie (born ) Bishop of Mont-Laurier

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mont-Laurier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,179
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014