Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noël Simard

Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1947 Born
28 May 197224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
16 Jul 200860.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
16 Jul 200860.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
3 Oct 200860.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
30 Dec 201164.0AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
23 Feb 201264.2InstalledBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Noël Simard
Bishop Noël Simard (born ) Bishop of Valleyfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Aimé-des-Lacs

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valleyfield.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,975
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018