Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Plouffe

Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1940 BornOttawa
12 Jun 196524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ottawa, Ontario, Canada
12 Dec 198646.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
12 Dec 198646.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
24 Feb 198746.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella
2 Dec 198949.1AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Plouffe:
Bishop Jean-Louis Plouffe (born ) Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013