Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jon Paul Christian Hansen, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1967 Born
16 Oct 199831.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Oct 200235.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Sep 200336.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Apr 200437.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Dec 201750.8AppointedBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada
16 Mar 201851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jon Paul Christian Hansen
Bishop Jon Paul Christian Hansen C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdmonton, Archdiocese of Edmonton, Alberta
Ordained DeaconSudbury, Diocese of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario
Ordained PriestGrande Prairie, Archdiocese of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick's High School gymnasium, Yellowknife, NWT

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2017
  • c1: CB, 15 Dec 2017
  • ob: CB, 29 Dec 2017
  • c2: CB, 2 Jan 2018
  • c34: CB, 7 Jan 2018
  • mn: CB, 16 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast