Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Sherlock

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of London, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1926Born
3 Jun 195024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
25 Jun 197448.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
25 Jun 197448.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
28 Aug 197448.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana in Mauretania
7 Jul 197852.4AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
21 Aug 197852.5InstalledBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
27 Apr 200276.2RetiredBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
12 Aug 201993.5DiedBishop Emeritus of London, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Michael Sherlock
Bishop John Michael Sherlock (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegina
Death PlaceLondon, Diocese of London, Ontario
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter’s, Cemetery, London, Diocese of London, Ontario

  • a priest for 69.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Aug 2019
  • 23.loc: CB, 14 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 29 Sep 2019

Quantcast