Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Paul Bergie

Bishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1959 BornHamilton
12 May 198425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
11 Jul 200546.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
11 Jul 200546.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabae
24 Aug 200546.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabae
14 Sep 201051.7AppointedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
9 Nov 201051.8InstalledBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gerard Paul Bergie:
Bishop Gerard Paul Bergie (born ) Bishop of Saint Catharines

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Catharines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,966

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013