Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Francis Ustrzycki

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Nationa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1932 Born
30 May 195927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
10 May 198553.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
10 May 198553.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nationa
3 Jul 198553.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nationa
1 Jun 200775.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Matthew Francis Ustrzycki
Bishop Matthew Francis Ustrzycki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Catharines

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018