Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Lawrence Wilhelm

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1909BornWalkerton
9 Jun 193424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
25 Jun 196353.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
25 Jun 196353.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Saccaea
22 Aug 196353.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saccaea
14 Dec 196657.1AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
12 Mar 198272.3ResignedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
25 Jun 199585.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lawrence Wilhelm:
Archbishop Joseph Lawrence Wilhelm (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013