Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul John O’Byrne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calgary, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1922Born
21 Feb 194825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
20 Jun 196845.4AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
22 Aug 196845.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
19 Jan 199875.0ResignedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
2 Sep 200481.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Calgary, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Paul John O’Byrne
Bishop Paul John O’Byrne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calgary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalgary

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018