Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Patrick Carroll

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calgary, Alberta

Titular Bishop of Horrea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1890BornToronto
2 Jun 191726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
19 Dec 193545.4AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
19 Feb 193645.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
28 Dec 196676.4RetiredBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
28 Dec 196676.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea
25 Feb 196776.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Calgary, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Francis Patrick Carroll:
Bishop Francis Patrick Carroll (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calgary

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015