Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Kidd

Deceased

Bishop of London, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1868BornAthlone
16 Feb 190233.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 192556.4AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
6 May 192556.6Ordained BishopBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
3 Jul 193162.8AppointedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada
2 Jun 195081.7DiedBishop of London, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Kidd:
Bishop John Thomas Kidd (born , died ) Bishop of London

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015