Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Joseph Monahan

Deceased

Archbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1882Born
4 Jul 190927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
10 Jun 193250.0AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
10 Aug 193250.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
26 Jun 193553.1AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
6 May 194765.0DiedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Monahan
Archbishop Peter Joseph Monahan (born , died ) Archbishop of Regina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Lin-dès-Laurentides

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018