Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Regina

Archidioecesis Reginatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Daniel Joseph Bohan, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 December 1915
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Saskatchewan
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 151,375 (58,468 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: Reg
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archregina.sk.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 445 Broad Street N., Regina, SK S4R 2X8, Canada
  • Telephone: (306)352-1651
  • Fax: 352-6313

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Regina
4 March 1910ErectedArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface Diocese of Regina (erected)
Archdiocese of Regina
4 December 1915ElevatedDiocese of Regina Archdiocese of Regina
31 January 1930Territory LostArchdiocese of Regina Diocese of Gravelbourg (erected)
14 September 1998Territory AddedDiocese of Gravelbourg (suppressed) Archdiocese of Regina
Diocese of Saskatoon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Regina
195070,000425,00016.5%1017417540074385225ap1951
1966100,000435,00023.0%10274176568136477101ap1967
1970100,000435,00023.0%986516361385350101ap1971
197691,325431,90621.1%785913766662294193ap1977
198092,000435,00021.1%885113966156270188ap1981
1990126,500461,00027.4%75351101,15039178176ap1991
1999127,710454,86528.1%85261111,15031187167ap2000
2000127,750454,89028.1%7719961,330224170167ap2001
2001126,000448,00028.1%7511861,465316145167ap2002
2002126,000448,00028.1%7915941,340220150165ap2003
2003126,000448,00028.1%88121001,260317128167ap2004
2004120,000392,00030.6%8315981,224321119168ap2005
2010125,800412,00030.5%88141021,23321979167ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013