Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Vernon Weisgerber

Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1938 BornVibank
1 Jun 196325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
7 Mar 199657.8AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
3 May 199658.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
7 Jun 200062.0AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
24 Aug 200062.3InstalledArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
28 Oct 201375.4RetiredArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Vernon Weisgerber
Archbishop James Vernon Weisgerber (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Winnipeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,717
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Jul 2016