Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Joseph Mallon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Regina, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1929BornPrince Rupert
27 May 195626.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 198959.9AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
2 Feb 199060.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
9 Jun 199565.5AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
30 Mar 200575.3RetiredArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
3 Feb 200777.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Mallon:
Archbishop Peter Joseph Mallon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Regina

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,958
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013