Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donald Joseph Bolen

Archbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1961 BornGravelbourg
12 Oct 199130.6Ordained PriestPriest of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
21 Dec 200948.8AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
25 Mar 201049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
11 Jul 201655.4AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
14 Oct 201655.6InstalledArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Donald Joseph Bolen
Archbishop Donald Joseph Bolen (born ) Archbishop of Regina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Regina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,597
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2016
  • i: CB, 15 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016