Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Joseph Bohan

Deceased

Archbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1941Born
13 May 196725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
14 May 200361.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
14 May 200361.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Migirpa
3 Jul 200361.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Migirpa
30 Mar 200563.3AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
15 Jan 201674.1DiedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Daniel Joseph Bohan
Archbishop Daniel Joseph Bohan (born , died ) Archbishop of Regina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYarmouth
Ordained BishopSaint Augustine, Church, Moncton, Archdiocese of Moncton, New Brunswick
Death PlaceHospital, Regina, Archdiocese of Regina, Saskatchewan
Buried Place (Original)Moncton, Archdiocese of Moncton, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,420
  • d: CB, 15 Jan 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast