Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles Aimé Halpin

Deceased

Archbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1930BornSaint-Eustache
27 May 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
24 Sep 197343.1AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
26 Nov 197343.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
12 Dec 197343.3InstalledArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
16 Apr 199463.6DiedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles Aimé Halpin:
Archbishop Charles Aimé Halpin (born , died ) Archbishop of Regina

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1994, Page 562
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013