Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Prince-Albert

Dioecesis Principis Albertensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Albert Privet Thévenot, M. Afr., Bishop
  • Blaise-Ernest Morand, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 9 June 1933
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Regina
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: Saskatchewan
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 118,834 (45,899 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: West (Ouest)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: PA
  • Official Web Site: http://www.padiocese.ca/
  • Mailing Address: 1415 - 4ème Avenue Ouest, Prince-Albert, Sask., S6V 5H1, Canada
  • Telephone: (306)922-4747
  • Fax: 922-4754

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Saskatchewan
4 June 1891ErectedArchdiocese of Saint-Boniface Vicariate Apostolic of Saskatchewan (erected)
Diocese of Prince-Albert
2 December 1907ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Saskatchewan Diocese of Prince-Albert (erected)
Diocese of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon
30 April 1921Name ChangedDiocese of Prince-Albert Diocese of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon
6 May 1921Territory LostDiocese of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon Territorial Abbey of Saint Peter-Muenster (erected)
Diocese of Prince-Albert
9 June 1933SplitDiocese of Prince-Albert-Saskatoon Diocese of Prince-Albert
Diocese of Saskatoon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Prince-Albert
195032,600130,50025.0%3266983326622349ap1951
196638,500223,50017.2%565811433737373126ap1967
197039,51749551043795929755ap1971
197642,818190,00022.5%4140815284721552ap1977
198045,200195,50023.1%4132736194119452ap1981
199048,630210,50023.1%35175293512112784ap1991
199952,337185,00028.3%2414381,37721610085ap2000
200039,623184,00021.5%3612488252149185ap2001
200140,149184,00021.8%3112439332139085ap2002
200239,760184,00021.6%3313468642148791ap2003
200339,589184,00021.5%2912419652128488ap2004
200440,732184,00022.1%3113449251138887ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013