Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Michael Kasun, C.S.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario

Titular Bishop of Lavellum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1951 BornCudworth
24 Jun 197826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of St. Basil
17 Jun 201664.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
17 Jun 201664.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lavellum
12 Sep 201664.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lavellum

MicroData Summary for Robert Michael Kasun
Bishop Robert Michael Kasun C.S.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toronto

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 15 Jul 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016