Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Christopher Cardinal Collins

Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario

Cardinal-Priest of San Patrizio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1947 BornGuelph
14 May 197225.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
5 May 197326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
25 Mar 199750.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
14 May 199750.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
30 Jun 199750.4SucceededBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
18 Feb 199952.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
7 Jun 199952.3SucceededArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
13 Sep 199952.6InstalledArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
16 Mar 200154.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
8 Sep 200154.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
16 Dec 200659.9AppointedArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
30 Jan 200760.0InstalledArchbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
18 Feb 201265.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201265.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Patrizio
23 Oct 201265.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Patrizio

MicroData Summary for Thomas Christopher Collins:
Thomas Christopher Cardinal Collins (born ) Archbishop of Toronto

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Toronto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,001
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1p06: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015