Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Andrzej Dąbrowski, C.S.M.A.

Auxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada

Titular Bishop of Casae in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1964 Born
4 May 199126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Michael the Archangel
31 Jan 201550.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
31 Jan 201550.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
14 Apr 201550.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Józef Andrzej Dąbrowski
Bishop Józef Andrzej Dąbrowski C.S.M.A. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of London

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWysoka Strzyżowska, Poland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of London.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 8 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 11 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,477

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast