Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory John Bittman

Bishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1961 Born
15 Aug 199635.4Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
14 Jul 201251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
14 Jul 201251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caltadria
3 Sep 201251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caltadria
13 Feb 201856.9AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
25 Apr 201857.1InstalledBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Gregory John Bittman
Bishop Gregory John Bittman (born ) Bishop of Nelson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdmonton, Archdiocese of Edmonton, Alberta
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral Basilica, Edmonton, Archdiocese of Edmonton, Alberta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nelson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,533
  • bp: CB, 8 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2018
  • i: Website of the Diocese, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Aug 2018

Quantcast