Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin Ibberson Webster

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1898Born
26 May 192325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
24 Sep 194648.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
24 Sep 194648.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
21 Nov 194648.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
21 Apr 195456.1AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
12 Mar 196870.0ResignedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
12 Mar 196870.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
27 Nov 197072.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
18 Jan 198182.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Ibberson Webster
Bishop Benjamin Ibberson Webster (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpofforth, Great Britain

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast