Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Bernard Henry

Bishop Emeritus of Calgary, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1943 Born
25 May 196825.1Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
18 Apr 198643.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
18 Apr 198643.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carinola
24 Jun 198643.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carinola
24 Mar 199551.9AppointedBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada
11 May 199552.0InstalledBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada
19 Jan 199854.7AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
19 Mar 199854.9InstalledBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
4 Jan 201773.7ResignedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Frederick Bernard Henry
Bishop Frederick Bernard Henry (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Calgary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Diocese of London, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Calgary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jan 2017