Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Leo John Hennessy, C. R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1919Born
30 Jul 195031.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
28 Feb 197556.1AppointedBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
14 May 197556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
1 Jun 199576.4RetiredBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
13 Feb 199778.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Brian Leo John Hennessy
Bishop Brian Leo John Hennessy C. R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in Bermuda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, MI, USA

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018