Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Kurtz, C. R.

Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in Bermuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1939 BornChicago, IL, USA
6 Jan 195919.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
11 Mar 196727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
1981²41.4AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
1993²53.4ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
1 Jun 199555.8AppointedBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
15 Sep 199556.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles
13 Jun 201575.8RetiredBishop of Hamilton in Bermuda, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Kurtz:
Bishop Robert Joseph Kurtz C. R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton in Bermuda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton in Bermuda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,609
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015