Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Terrence McGrattan

Bishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1956 Born
2 May 198730.6Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
6 Nov 200953.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
6 Nov 200953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
12 Jan 201053.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
8 Apr 201457.5AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
4 Jan 201760.2AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
27 Feb 201760.4InstalledBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Terrence McGrattan
Bishop William Terrence McGrattan (born ) Bishop of Calgary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, ON, Diocese of London, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Calgary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,554
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2017
  • i: CB, 6 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jan 2017