Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Ovide Bourgon

Bishop of Hearst, Ontario

Apostolic Administrator of Moosonee, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1956 BornSudbury
8 May 198125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
2 Feb 201659.8AppointedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
2 Feb 201659.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Moosonee, Ontario, Canada
25 Apr 201660.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Robert Ovide Bourgon
Bishop Robert Ovide Bourgon (born ) Bishop of Hearst

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hearst.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 22 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016