Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Douglas Crosby, O.M.I.

Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1949 BornMarathon
16 Sep 197324.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
27 Sep 197526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Oct 199748.3AppointedBishop of Labrador City-Schefferville, Québec, Canada
2 Jan 199848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Labrador City-Schefferville, Québec, Canada
4 Jan 199848.5InstalledBishop of Labrador City-Schefferville, Québec, Canada
6 Aug 200354.1AppointedBishop of Saint George’s, Newfoundland, Canada
31 May 200757.9AppointedBishop of Corner Brook and Labrador, Newfoundland, Canada
24 Sep 201061.2AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
8 Nov 201061.4InstalledBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for David Douglas Crosby:
Bishop David Douglas Crosby O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Hamilton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hamilton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013